RI S0090 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-22 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-22 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Personal Income Tax - Establishment Of Arts District (would Establish A New Arts District Within The Town Of Bristol For Purposes Of The Tax Exemption Provided To Writers, Composers, And Other Artists.)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Personal Income Tax - Establishment Of Arts District (would Establish A New Arts District Within The Town Of Bristol For Purposes Of The Tax Exemption Provided To Writers, Composers, And Other Artists.)
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-22 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2013) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0090.pdf |