RI S0070 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratify amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Middletown, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of Middletown on November 6, 2018.
Title
Validating And Ratifying An Amendment To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Middletown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |