RI S0069 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the amount of life insurance for which the state will reimburse the cost of premiums to a mobilized Rhode Island National Guard member from four hundred thousand dollars ($400,000) to five hundred thousand dollars ($500,000).
Title
Relating To Military Affairs And Defense
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2015) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0069.pdf |