RI S0064 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the permanent foundation educational aid program would provide state funding for school-based mental health services pursuant to specified conditions.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |