RI S0064 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/08/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/08/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of automated traffic-speed camera-enforcement systems on all state and local roads within the state, not just in school zones
Title
Automated Traffic Speed Enforcement System
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/08/2021) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0064.pdf |