RI S0051 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of through commercial vehicles on Turner Road in Middletown.
Title
Size, Weight And Load Limits -- Middletown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |