RI S0016 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates pilot program to establish harm reduction centers where use of pre-obtained controlled substances may occur under supervision of health care professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harm Reduction Center Advisory Committee And Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed Sub B in concurrence
2021-06-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-29HouseHouse passed Sub B
2021-06-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/29/2021)
2021-06-25HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2021-06-24HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-23HouseScheduled for consideration (06/25/2021)
2021-02-25HouseReferred to House Health & Human Services
2021-02-23SenateSenate passed Sub A
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (02/23/2021)
2021-02-11SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-02-10SenateProposed Substitute
2021-02-05SenateScheduled for consideration (02/11/2021)
2021-01-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2021)
2021-01-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback