RI S0013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the council on elementary and secondary education would not grant approval for the creation or expansion of any new charter school until after the 2022, 2023, 2024 school year.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/10/2021) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/27/2021) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Meeting postponed (01/20/2021) |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |