RI S0012 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Offenses Pertaining To Schools (would Permit Schools To Provide Activities For Students Of One Sex (for Example Father-daughter/mother-son Activities) Provided That Reasonably Comparable Activities Are Provided For Students Of The Other Sex.)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Offenses Pertaining To Schools (would Permit Schools To Provide Activities For Students Of One Sex (for Example Father-daughter/mother-son Activities) Provided That Reasonably Comparable Activities Are Provided For Students Of The Other Sex.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-20 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013) |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2013) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |