RI S0010 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Committee transferred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Urging Congress To Enact H.r. 1489, The "return To Prudent Banking Act Of 2011"
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Urging Congress To Enact H.r. 1489, The "return To Prudent Banking Act Of 2011"
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Commerce |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (02/28/2013) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0010.pdf |