RI H7324 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes changes to and clarify the definition of what constitutes unlawful confinement of a "covered animal" and would apply them throughout the chapter accordingly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016)
2016-01-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback