RI H8331 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Ian Madom to join Theodore G. Trafton and Courtney A. Mitchell in marriage on or about October 4, 2014, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | House read and passed |