RI H8321 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and ratifies the action of the North Providence town council which reapportions and redistricts its voting wards based on the most recent federal decennial census.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of North Providence To Establish, Adopt, And Reapportion The Town Council And School Committee Voting Wards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |