RI H8321 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Renewable Energy Development Fund (REF) program for ten years, from 2017 to 2027.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers -- Utility Base Rate
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H8321.pdf |