RI H8313 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a youth pregnancy and at-risk prevention services program to be administered by the department of human services. The director of the department will make an annual allocation of $250,000 through federal funds.
Title
Human Services - Youth Pregnancy And At-risk Prevention Services Program
Sponsors
Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed as amended |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |