RI H8293 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the law requiring a mortgagee to participate in good faith in a mediation conference prior to initiating foreclosure proceedings and would also repeal the law requiring mortgagees to send a notice advising mortgagors of the right to counseling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-08HouseSigned by Governor
2014-07-03HouseTransmitted to Governor
2014-06-20SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2014-06-20SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
2014-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2014-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2014)
2014-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2014-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2014)
2014-06-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-06-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014)
2014-06-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback