RI H8292 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Emily Bruce to join Robert McKay and Caroline Mailloux in marriage on or about September 29, 2018, within the City of East Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2018) |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |