RI H8289 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Mary Ann Shallcross Smith to join Doreen S. Suprenard and Robert B. Kerfoot in marriage on or about July 1, 2022, within the City of Pawtucket, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-06-07 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |