RI H8287 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of licenses for new initial nursing facilities and any increases to nursing facilities capacity to July 1, 2025.
Title
Licensing Of Healthcare Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |