RI H8283 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Meeting postponed (06/10/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Meeting postponed (06/10/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make a number of changes to the enabling act for the Warwick Sewer Authority.
Title
Sewer Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Meeting postponed (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-06-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H8283.pdf |