RI H8272 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows John Higley to join Gillian Marino and Nathaniel William Higley in marriage on or about June 25, 2016, within the Town of New Shoreham, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-31 | House | House read and passed |