RI H8270 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island clean diesel fund for the purpose of reducing emissions from heavy-duty diesel engines operating on state roads.
Title
Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles-clean Diesel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |