RI H8263 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the board of education membership from eleven (11) members to seventeen (17), and requires the board to consider several new criteria as important components of the public education system.
Title
The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-11 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |