RI H8257 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Issue Not To Exceed $235,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of New Elementary, Middle And High Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, And All Attendant Expenses Including, But Not Limited To, Demolition, Engineering And Architectural Costs; Provided That, The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Issue Not To Exceed $235,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of New Elementary, Middle And High Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, And All Attendant Expenses Including, But Not Limited To, Demolition, Engineering And Architectural Costs; Provided That, The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |