RI H8251 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property belonging to Habitat for Humanity of Rhode Island-Greater Providence, Inc., a Rhode Island nonprofit corporation, located in Providence, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-26HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2016-07-18HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-17HouseHouse read and passed
2016-06-17HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-17HouseCommittee recommends passage
2016-06-17HouseScheduled for consideration (06/17/2016)
2016-06-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-05-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2016)
2016-05-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback