RI H8247 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the city of East Providence to issue not more than $189,500,000 bonds, notes and other evidences of indebtedness to finance the acquisition, construction, furnishing and equipping of a new high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The City Of East Providence To Finance The Acquisition, Construction, Furnishing And Equipping Of A New High School And All Expenses Incident Thereto, Including, But Not Limited To, Costs Of Design, Demolition, Athletic Fields, Landscaping And Parking By The Issuance Of Not More Than $189,500,000 Bonds, Notes And/or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-18HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-31HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-05-31HouseMeeting postponed (05/31/2018)
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-05-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback