RI H8247 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of East Providence to issue not more than $189,500,000 bonds, notes and other evidences of indebtedness to finance the acquisition, construction, furnishing and equipping of a new high school.
Title
Authorizing The City Of East Providence To Finance The Acquisition, Construction, Furnishing And Equipping Of A New High School And All Expenses Incident Thereto, Including, But Not Limited To, Costs Of Design, Demolition, Athletic Fields, Landscaping And Parking By The Issuance Of Not More Than $189,500,000 Bonds, Notes And/or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-05-31 | House | Meeting postponed (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-05-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |