RI H8235 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the town of North Smithfield to issue two million five hundred thousand and 00/100 dollars $2,500,000 of general obligation bonds and notes in order to finance the repair and rehabilitation of local road infrastructure.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of North Smithfield To Finance The Repair And Rehabilitation Of Local Road Infrastructure By The Issuance Of Not More Than $2,500,000 Of Bonds And/or Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |