RI H8232 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the growth of hemp by properly licensed individuals that have applied and met the requirements of this chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture And Forestry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House of Representatives - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-12HouseSigned by Governor
2016-07-08HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2016-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-16HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-16HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/16/2016)
2016-06-15HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-12HouseScheduled for consideration (06/15/2016)
2016-05-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-05-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2016)
2016-05-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback