RI H8228 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds propane to the definition of fuels for tax purposes but not propane used for a purpose other than the operation or propulsion of motor vehicles.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |