RI H8218 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES - Mandates health insurance coverage to include transportation for emergency services by ambulance or rescue.
Title
Mandates health insurance coverage to include transportation for emergency services by ambulance or rescue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-05-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8218.pdf |