RI H8208 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure--courts -- Family Court (would Provide The Family Court With Jurisdiction Over All Protective Orders Being Sought By A Juvenile)
Title
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure--courts -- Family Court (would Provide The Family Court With Jurisdiction Over All Protective Orders Being Sought By A Juvenile)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-02 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8208.pdf |