RI H8203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes commercial low speed vehicles of 8 persons or less to operate on roadways of the city of Newport as a commercial jitney service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Low Speed Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/14/2018)
2018-05-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback