RI H8193 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the penalties which public works contractors can be assessed for failing to properly pay persons for the services they provide to them.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors' Bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-13HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2016-08-05HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2016-06-17HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-17HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-17HouseScheduled for consideration (06/17/2016)
2016-06-16HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Labor
2016-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/16/2016)
2016-06-16HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-16HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/16/2016)
2016-06-15HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-12HouseScheduled for consideration (06/15/2016)
2016-05-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-05-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2016)
2016-05-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback