RI H8182 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the display of a POW/MIA chair of honor in the State House, commemorating the men and women of the United States armed forces taken as prisoners of war or listed as missing in action.
Title
Public Buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-16 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-30 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-28 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2014) |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |