RI H8180 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Explore The Construction Of A Gulf Wars Veterans Memorial (this Resolution Would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special House Commission To Explore The Construction Of A Gulf Wars Veterans Memorial From June 30, 2018, To June 30, 2019, And Said Commission Would Expire On August 30, 2019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Explore The Construction Of A Gulf Wars Veterans Memorial (this Resolution Would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special House Commission To Explore The Construction Of A Gulf Wars Veterans Memorial From June 30, 2018, To June 30, 2019, And Said Commission Would Expire On August 30, 2019.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-17HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-05-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback