RI H8178 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a state seal of biliteracy to recognize high school graduates who have attained a high level of proficiency in listening, speaking, reading, and writing in one or more languages in addition to English.
Title
Biliteracy Seal
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2016-06-02 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2016) |
2016-05-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |