RI H8173 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry - Livestock - Welfare Of Livestock

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry - Livestock - Welfare Of Livestock

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21 Signed by Governor
2012-06-15 Transmitted to Governor
2012-06-12 Senate passed in concurrence
2012-06-11 Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar
2012-06-11 House read and passed
2012-06-08 Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012)
2012-06-05 Committee recommends passage
2012-06-01 Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2012)
2012-05-24 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2012-05-22 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2012)
2012-05-17 Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback