RI H8170 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the privileged nature of communications to interpreters of that communications as long as the interpreters are officially working for the state office of court interpreters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Official Court Interpreters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-11HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-05-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2016)
2016-05-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback