RI H8170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the extension of credit to players at the Twin River gaming facility, and would establish the statutory guidelines governing such extension of credit.
Title
Video Lottery Terminal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |