RI H8150 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that if an insured has one or more motor vehicles with uninsured motorist’s coverage, the insured is permitted to collect up to the aggregate amount of coverage for all vehicles covered by the insurance policies.
Title
Liability Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8150.pdf |