RI H8132 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows distribution and utilization of narcotic testing products to assist persons in determining whether drugs contain toxic substances.
Title
The Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |