RI H8130 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - House voted to recommit to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - House voted to recommit to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends procedures regarding local liquor license appeals.
Title
Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | House voted to recommit to House Corporations |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/09/2018) |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8130.pdf |