RI H8129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides specific language for signs posted at establishments notifying people of contact information to national human trafficking resource center and deletes provision enabling department of labor and training to impose fines for failure to post signs.
Title
Trafficking Of Persons And Involuntary Servitude
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8129.pdf |