RI H8129 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit casinos from attaching the real estate of any person who is providing a casino marker or line of credit by the casino.
Title
Levy And Sale On Execution
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |