RI H8127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the department of health to use funds from federal capitalization grants to conduct baseline copper and lead testing the water supply systems of each local government as well as in public schools and licensed daycare facilities.
Title
Lead And Copper Drinking Water Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-09 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-04-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |