RI H8125 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect from public disclosure all individually identifiable evaluations of public school superintendents, administrators, principals, and all other school employees.
Title
Relating To Public Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H8125.pdf |