RI H8124 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain communications and information of a proprietary nature produced or received by faculty, staff, employees, or students at state institutions of higher education would not be deemed a public record.
Title
Access To Public Records
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/10/2016) |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-04-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |