RI H8117 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires tax administrator to send written notice to persons failing to file tax returns/pay taxes informing them they will be prevented from renewing operator license/vehicle registration and procedures to contest determination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22SenateCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-29HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-05-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-04-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback