RI H8116 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits withholding aid for infraction of laws and regulation during an intervention or other exercise of control. Would be retroactive to 1/1/21 for orders under section 16-5-30.
Title
State Aid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8116.pdf |